Harris v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Lana Harris
Defendant: Jarrod L Ramer, Zack Smith and Noble County
Case Number: 1:2019cv00018
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #17 Motion for Permission to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone is deemed moot as the Court has reset the hearing to be held telephonically 18 . Text entry order. (mr)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lana Harris re #9 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Attorney Client Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Client Signature page)(Guin-Lowry, Rachel)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The in-person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 9:30 am is converted to a telephonic hearing. Court will initiate call. Counsel only required to attend. Text entry order.(mr)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Motion for Permission to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone by Defendants Noble County, Zack Smith. (Wilkins, Eric)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Noble County, Zack Smith.(Wilkins, Eric)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Noble County, Zack Smith. (Atkinson, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Wilkins on behalf of Noble County, Zack Smith (Wilkins, Eric)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court on its own motion VACATES the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 am and RESETS it for 3/18/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court. Text entry order.(mr)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Jarrod L Ramer.(Jansen, Lori) Modified on 2/7/2019 to include jury demand(kjp).
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Pla and Dfts to appear. (mr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Jarrod L Ramer (Jansen, Lori)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Jarrod L Ramer (Myers, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #5 Noble County and Zack Smith answer due 3/14/2019 (nae)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Bunnell on behalf of Noble County, Zack Smith (Bunnell, Scott)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Noble County, Zack Smith ; answer due by March 14, 2019. (Atkinson, Joshua)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A Atkinson on behalf of Noble County, Zack Smith (Atkinson, Joshua)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Noble County, Jarrod L Ramer, Zack Smith. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksc)
January 18, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added (NEW CASE). (ksc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J Guin-Lowry on behalf of Lana Harris (Guin-Lowry, Rachel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Zack Smith, Noble County, Jarrod L Ramer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3786979.), filed by Lana Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Guin-Lowry, Rachel) Modified to correct docket text (added names of defendants) on 1/18/2019 (ksc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod L Ramer
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Lori W Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Smith
Represented By: Eric M Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua A Atkinson
Represented By: Scott L Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble County
Represented By: Eric M Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua A Atkinson
Represented By: Scott L Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Harris
Represented By: Rachel J Guin-Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?