United States of America v. Mock
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Connie Mock and Connie Jo Mock
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Connie Mock served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Connie Mock. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
February 5, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connie Mock, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Jo Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah M Leonard - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?