IMO the Tax Indebtedness of
Petitioner: United States of America
In Re: Larry Bledsoe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Larry Bledsoe shall have 30 days from the date of this Order, that is until 5/16/2019, to file with the Clerk of the Court a written Objection to Petition as outlined in this Notice and Order. No other issue may be raised in the objection. If Larry Bledsoe fails to file a timely written objection that makes the showing required by this order to show cause with the Clerk of the Court or he files a proper objection but fails to appear for the scheduled hearing, the Court will, upon the prima facie showing made in the United States' petition, enter an order to approve the requested levy on said property. If Larry Bledsoe files an objection with the Clerk of the Court, he must also mail a copy of the objection, on or before the filing date, to the attorneys for the United States at addresses listed in this Order. A copy of this notice and order to show cause, together with the United States' petition and declaration, shall be served upon Larry Bledsoe within 10 days of the date of this order by a person authorized to make service under Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as outlined in this Notice and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/16/2019. (lns)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Converting case to a civil action and to randomly assign a district court judge as the presider. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/20/19. (mlc)
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Judicial Approval of Levy Upon Principal Residence against Larry Bledsoe, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Nunez - AUSA, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMO the Tax Indebtedness of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey N Nunez - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Larry Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?