Stedge v. Grace Schools Inc

Plaintiff: Clinton Stedge
Defendant: Grace Schools, Inc., d//b/a Grace College Graduate Studies and Grace Schools Inc
Undetermined: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Martha Lemert. Dft appeared by atty Matthew Elliott. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 11/22/2019. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Elliott to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Lemert. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clinton Stedge. Grace Schools Inc served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Lemert, Martha)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Matthew)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor A Beaty on behalf of Grace Schools Inc (Beaty, Taylor)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person. (mr)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: Dft's Answer due 5/6/19 per DE #5 (kjp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grace Schools Inc. (Elliott, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Grace Schools Inc ; answer due by May 6, 2019. (Elliott, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Elliott on behalf of Grace Schools Inc (Elliott, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued (2) as to Grace Schools Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
March 7, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Clinton Stedge (Lemert, Martha)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Grace Schools, Inc,( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3828935.), filed by Clinton Stedge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons c/o Registered Agent, #3 Proposed Summons Attn: Highest Ranking Officer)(Lemert, Martha) Modified on 3/7/2019 to modify dft (sct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stedge v. Grace Schools Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Schools, Inc., d//b/a Grace College Graduate Studies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Schools Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Elliott
Represented By: Taylor A Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Stedge
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?