Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher E Washington
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 USCA Briefing Order as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document - banners) (bas).
July 8, 2019 Filing 43 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505, receipt number 1010263 re #29 Notice of Appeal. (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Expedite Appeal Status by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (cc: USCA) (bas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Reconsideration and Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 USCA CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #30 Motion for issuance of subpoena; DENYING #32 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING #33 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court certifies that Plaintiffs appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 6/20/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party and USCA)(mlc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to #35 Clerks Judgment. (mrm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 USCA Case Number 19-2152 for #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 Short Record sent electronically to US Court of Appeals re #29 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (bas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (bas).
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (copy mailed to pro se via certified mail - receipt #7000 1670 0012 9260 9673)(mrm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis re #33 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orders)(bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 WITNESS STATEMENT by Kristina Walling for Christopher E. Washington. (bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena, #2 Proposed Subpoena)(bas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Opinion and Order by Christopher E Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Appeal and Memorandum)(bas)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTS #13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or alternatively, for summary judgment. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. All other pending motions [ECF NOS. 4,8,11,18,21,23 AND 26] are termed as MOOT. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 6/6/2019.(Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm).
June 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Impose Sanction by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Amend/Correct and OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Move Forward with Plaintiff's Third Proposed Final Judgment #22 by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Third Proposed Final Judgment by Christopher E Washington. (bas) Modified on 5/21/2019 (bas).
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Complaint) (bas). Modified on 5/21/2019 (bas).
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas) Modified on 5/21/2019 (bas).
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION for Hearing, #11 MOTION for Leave to File to Schedule a Hearing to Enter Summary Judgment filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION for Hearing, #11 MOTION for Leave to File to Schedule a Hearing to Enter Summary Judgment by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION for Hearing to Entery Summary Judgment filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Second Proposed Final Judgment by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #14 Memorandum in Support, (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Johnson with Exhibits A-J)(Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter, Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Schedule a Hearing to Enter Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION for Hearing to Entery Summary Judgment filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION for Hearing to Entery Summary Judgment filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION for Hearing to Entery Summary Judgment by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc) (copy mailed to pro se party)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT filed by Christopher E Washington. (bas)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Extension of Time. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/11/19. (cc: copy mailed to pro se party) (ksp)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Schedule a Hearing to Enter Summary Judgment by Pla Christopher E Washington. (lns)
March 20, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer -Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-1902-CT-000086, filed by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonard - AUSA, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Deborah M Leonard - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Deborah M Leonard - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?