Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. v. harvee properties et al
Plaintiff: Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. and Super 8 Worldwide Inc
Defendant: harvee properties, paresh patel and Harvee Properties LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00145
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Super 8 Worldwide Inc (Pendexter, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cer)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #24 Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Initial Pretrial Conference is granted. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 7/15/2019 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Initial Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Super 8 Worldwide Inc. (Hinshaw, James)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court on its own motion VACATES the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 am and RESETS it for 6/17/2019 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order. (mr)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #20 Dft Harvee Properties, LLC's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading is granted. Dft Harvee Properties, LLC is granted to and including 6/30/2019 to file an answer or responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #19 Dft, Paresh Patel's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading is granted. Dft granted to and including 6/24/2019 to file an answer or responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Harvee Properties LLC. (Ramsey, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Paresh Patel. (Lepley, Lindsay)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Bryan P. Couch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. (During PHV, Patrick)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick E During PHV for Super 8 Worldwide Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 05/21/2019. (ace)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Patrick E. During to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 was received on 4-12-2019, receipt number 0755-3862349 (Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) Modified (to include payment information) on 5/21/2019 (ace).
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 am (EST) in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Harvee Properties LLC. (Ramsey, William)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Ramsey on behalf of Harvee Properties LLC (Ramsey, William)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/01/19. (efc)
April 29, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #10 Defendant Paresh Patel answer due 5/24/2019. (rmc)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Paresh Patel ; answer due by May 24, 2019. (Lepley, Lindsay)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Hurni Lepley on behalf of Paresh Patel (Lepley, Lindsay)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Super 8 Worldwide Inc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Pendexter, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Bryan P. Couch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3862349 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Attorney in Support of Motion to Appear PHV)(Hinshaw, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Patrick E. During to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3862309 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Attorney in Support of Motion to Appear PHV)(Hinshaw, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harvee Properties LLC, Paresh Patel. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
April 8, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Hinshaw on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide Inc (Hinshaw, James)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC for Super 8 Worldwide, Inc... (Pendexter, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Miller Pendexter on behalf of Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. (Pendexter, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harvee Properties and Paresh Patel against Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3856283.), filed by Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - December 29, 2017 Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - September 14, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - October 18, 2018 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Pendexter, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. v. harvee properties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Miller Pendexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super 8 Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Andrew Miller Pendexter
Represented By: Patrick E During PHV
Represented By: James M Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: harvee properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: paresh patel
Represented By: Lindsay Hurni Lepley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvee Properties LLC
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?