Perera v. Brunswick Corporation
Plaintiff: Sriyan C. Perera
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00154
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Dispositive motions to be filed by 2/17/2020. Counsel for all parties shall participate in at least one settlement conference prior to any future telephonic status and scheduling conference. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/5/2019. (lns)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Ilene Smith. Atty Richard Jarrold and Andrian Clark, Human Resource Manager, appeared on behalf of Dft.The #7 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 1/17/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Smith to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Jarrold. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/25/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jarrold, Richard)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Defendant Representative to attend.(mr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brunswick Corporation. (Jarrold, Richard)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brunswick Corporation.(Jarrold, Richard)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brunswick Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
April 9, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Brunswick Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3857729.), filed by Sriyan C. Perera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Myers, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perera v. Brunswick Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: Richard Evan Jarrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sriyan C. Perera
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?