Miller v. Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan and Amazon Corporate LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd D Wozniak PHV for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Amazon Corporate LLC, and Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 06/24/2019. (ace)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint , Aetna's and the Plan's Answer to Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan.(von Schleicher, W)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Amazon Corporate LLC. (Clapp, Abigail)
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Amazon Corporate LLC. (Clapp, Abigail)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 Application for Attorney Todd D. Wozniak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amazon Corporate, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3929700(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty John Theisen. Dfts appeared by attys W Sebastian von Schleicher and Abigail Clapp. Atty von Schleicher's unopposed oral motion to dismiss the jury demand for Count 1 is granted. The Administrative Record to be produced by 7/19/2019. Discovery deadline is 6/17/2020. Parties are to file a notice with the Court by 7/19/2019 advising of their selection of a mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/8/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #25 #26 Motions for Leave to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of Amazon.Com Services, Inc. are granted. The appearances of attys Warren Sebastian von Schleicher and Jacqueline J Herring are hereby withdrawn on behalf of Dft, Amazon Corporate LLC. Text entry order.(mr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Attorney Jacqueline J. Herring's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Defendant Amazon Corporate LLC. (Herring, Jacqueline)
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Attorney Warren von Schleicher's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Defendant Amazon Corporate LLC. (von Schleicher, W)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail A Clapp on behalf of Amazon Corporate LLC (Clapp, Abigail)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (von Schleicher, W)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Miller. Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Theisen, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Miller. Amazon Corporate LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Theisen, John)
May 21, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per #15 Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 6/21/2019; Amazon Corporate LLC answer due 6/21/2019; Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan answer due 6/21/2019. (rmc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2019 10:30 am (EST) in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan. (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Corporate LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Corporate LLC.. (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy Inc, Corporate Parent Aetna Inc, Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Amazon Corporate LLC, Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan ; answer due by June 21, 2019. (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Amazon Corporate LLC (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by W Sebastian von Schleicher on behalf of Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by W Sebastian von Schleicher on behalf of Amazon Corporate LLC (von Schleicher, W)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by W Sebastian von Schleicher on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (von Schleicher, W)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B Garrett on behalf of Michael Miller (Garrett, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Benefit Plan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter From Amazo)(Theisen, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Miller. Amazon Corporate LLC served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Theisen, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Miller. Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Theisen, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Amazon Corporate LLC, Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
April 25, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of michael miller (Hubley, Nathaniel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of michael miller (Theisen, John)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3872939.), filed by michael miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Benefit Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Amazon, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Aetna, #5 Proposed Summons Amazon LTD, #6 Proposed Summons Plan Administrator)(Theisen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Represented By: W Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Corporate LLC Long-Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Represented By: W Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Corporate LLC
Represented By: Todd D Wozniak PHV
Represented By: Abigail A Clapp
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Represented By: W Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: Nathaniel O Hubley
Represented By: John C Theisen
Represented By: Robert B Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?