Phillips v. Wedler et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Northeast Indiana, Kathy Wedler and Godwill Industries of NE In
Case Number: 1:2019cv00205
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Casie J Towsley on behalf of Godwill Industries of NE In, Kathy Wedler (Towsley, Casie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Myers, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION by Godwill Industries of NE In, Kathy Wedler to #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se Complaint . (Kimbrough, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Myers, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr (Myers, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Godwill Industries of NE In, Kathy Wedler.(Kimbrough, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of All Defendants (Kimbrough, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr. (bas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Kathy Wedler and Goodwill Industries of Northeast Indiana, filed by Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM-285)(bas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Wedler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Northeast Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Wedler
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Represented By: Casie J Towsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godwill Industries of NE In
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Represented By: Casie J Towsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Phillips, Sr
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?