Wisdom v. Tri-State Medical Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Erica Wisdom
Defendant: Tri-State Medical Group, LLC
Not Yet Classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Erica Wisdom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Myers, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Lori Jansen. Dft appeared by atty Joseph Cohen. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 4/17/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Jansen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Cohen. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/10/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Erica Wisdom (Jansen, Lori)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tri-State Medical Group, LLC. (Cohen, H)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Tri-State Medical Group, LLC.(Cohen, H)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cohen, H)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 5/15/2019. (lns)
May 13, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (jss)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Tri-State Medical Group, LLC ; answer due by June 20, 2019. (Steinhofer, Rachel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of Tri-State Medical Group, LLC (Steinhofer, Rachel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by H Joseph Cohen on behalf of Tri-State Medical Group, LLC (Cohen, H)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3888607.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-1905-CT-000250, filed by Tri-State Medical Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisdom v. Tri-State Medical Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Medical Group, LLC
Represented By: H Joseph Cohen
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Wisdom
Represented By: Lori W Jansen
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?