Calhoun v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Calhoun
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc., John Doe and Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00213
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 TELEPHONIC HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 6/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Kenneth Sinak. Dft appeared by attys Bailey Samuel and Sheri Bradtke McNeil. Atty Sinak anticipates filing a motion to file an Amended Complaint naming Aramark as an additional dft. Attys Samuel and Bradtke McNeil have no objection to the filing of an Amended Complaint. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 2:30 pm. Court to initiate call. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: On the Court's own motion, the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 am is CONVERTED to a telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Court will initiate call. Counsel only required to attend. Text entry order.(mr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT to #19 Appendix, #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Samuel PHV, Bailey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 APPENDIX to #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Proposed Order by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey)
June 17, 2019 CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. and John Doe ONLY re #15 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Pla's claims against Dft Johnson Controls Inc are not being dismissed. (lns)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Johnson Controls is AFFORDED to and including June 19, 2019, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/12/19. (ksp)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulation) by Defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., John Doe. (Miller, Calvert)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bailey Jenae Samuel PHV for Johnson Controls, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 05/31/2019. (ace)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing/Deadlines: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Defendant representatives to attend. (mr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Attorney Bailey J. Samuel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3907638(Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. ; answer due by June 19, 2019. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc..(Miller, Calvert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M Martin on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Martin, Kimberly)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kleber on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Kleber, Rebecca)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvert S Miller on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Miller, Calvert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Notice of Appearance . (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)
May 16, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Bradtke McNeil on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3894212.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1904-ct-000222, filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-State Court File, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Email dated 5-14-19, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradtke McNeil, Sheri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Calhoun
Represented By: Kenneth J Sinak
Represented By: Robert J Boughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Sheri Bradtke McNeil
Represented By: Bailey J Samuel PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Calvert S Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly M Martin
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Represented By: Calvert S Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?