Carter v. State of Indiana et al

Plaintiff: Richard Carter
Defendant: Kimberly White, VIRGINIA AVINA, State of Indiana and Summit City Investments Inc
Not Yet Classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00219
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE / Attorney Certification. (Myers, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Lori Jansen. Atty Benjamin Jones appeared with Dfts Kimberly White and Virginia Avina. The #23 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 5/15/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Jansen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Jones. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/10/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE by Attorney re: Fee Discussion with Client Kimberly White. (Jones, Benjamin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE by Attorney re: Fee Discussion with Client Virginia Avina. (Jones, Benjamin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Richard Carter (Jansen, Lori)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #24 Motion to Withdraw is granted. The appearance of Attorney David W Frank is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Plaintiff. Text entry order.(mr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Richard Carter. (Frank, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY FOR JUDGE WILLIAM C LEE: In light of the Amended Complaint filed in the Allen Superior Court on April 16, 2019, Defendant State of Indiana's #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED as MOOT. So Ordered. (lns)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #15 Motion for Protective Order. The parties may submit a revised stipulated protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/4/19. (ksp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Virginia Avina, State of Indiana, Kimberly White.(Jones, Benjamin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
May 21, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE, MOTIONS PENDING) (rmc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number INN1010069 (rmc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie A Slinker on behalf of VIRGINIA AVINA, State of Indiana, Kimberly White (Slinker, Mollie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M L Jones on behalf of VIRGINIA AVINA, State of Indiana, Kimberly White (Jones, Benjamin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allen Superior Court 9, Cause No. 02D09-1812-CT-701, filed by VIRGINIA AVINA, Kimberly White, State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, Summons, Appearances, Motions, Orders, Answers, and Case Chronology from State Court, #2 First Amended State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. State of Indiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly White
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Benjamin M L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA AVINA
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Benjamin M L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Indiana
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Represented By: Benjamin M L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit City Investments Inc
Represented By: Timothy W DeGroote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carter
Represented By: David W Frank
Represented By: Lori W Jansen
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?