Brown v. Avancez, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy H. Brown
Defendant: Avancez, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00231
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Avancez, LLC (Lemert, Martha)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avancez, LLC. Avancez, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Lemert, Martha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Avancez, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 7/1/2019. (Copy mailed to Defendant) (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (mrm)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received and DIRECTS, the clerk and the US Marshals to effect service of process on the defendants. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 5/30/2019. (mrm)
May 28, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 2 copies of summons forms and 2 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Timothy H. Brown. (Myers, Christopher)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Avancez, LLC, filed by Timothy H. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Myers, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Avancez, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avancez, LLC
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy H. Brown
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?