Dupont Hospital, LLC v. Myers
Plaintiff: Dupont Hospital LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Stacy R Myers
3Rd Party Defendant: BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (jss)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas ; answer due by 07/03/2019. (White, Sean)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas. (White, Sean)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean T White on behalf of USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas (White, Sean)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3908921.) from Dekalb County Superior Court 1, Cause No. 17D01-1903-CC-000154, filed by USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents Served on BlueAdvantage, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Sean) Modified on 5/31/2019 (jss).
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas filed in Dekalb Superior Court by Stacy R Myers.(jss)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Stacy R Myers, filed by Dupont Hospital LLC in Dekalb Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupont Hospital, LLC v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dupont Hospital LLC
Represented By: Tyler D Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Stacy R Myers
Represented By: William J Carlin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas
Represented By: Sean T White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?