Sanchez v. FWH Venture, LLC
Plaintiff: Mitilde L. Sanchez and Matilde L. Sanchez
Defendant: FWH Venture, LLC d/b/a Ramada Plaza Fort Wayne Hotel and Conference Center and FWH Venture LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00246
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 7/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Atty Ilene Smith appeared telephonically on behalf of Pla. Atty Anthony Stites appeared with Dft representative, Bill Bean. Mr. Bean shows cause for his failure to appear for the Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 7/17/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Anthony Stites. Dft representative, Bill Bean, failed to appear. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 6/26/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/7/2019. Counsel are to file a Notice with the Court if they wish to proceed with a Judicial Settlement Conference. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 3:30 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel for Dft and Dft representative, Bill Bean, are to appear in person. Dft representative, Bill Bean, is to show cause for his failure to appear for the hearing on 7/17/2019. Counsel for Pla may participate telephonically, with Court initiating call. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stites, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by FWH Venture LLC.(Stites, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FWH Venture LLC. (Stites, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 6/20/2019. (lns)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend. (mr)
June 6, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of FWH Venture, LLC d/b/a Ramada Plaza Fort Wayne Hotel and Conference Center (Steinhofer, Rachel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of FWH Venture, LLC d/b/a Ramada Plaza Fort Wayne Hotel and Conference Center (Stites, Anthony)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3913760.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1905-CT-000298, filed by FWH Venture, LLC d/b/a Ramada Plaza Fort Wayne Hotel and Conference Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stites, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. FWH Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitilde L. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matilde L. Sanchez
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FWH Venture, LLC d/b/a Ramada Plaza Fort Wayne Hotel and Conference Center
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FWH Venture LLC
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?