Johnson v. Bowen Center
Plaintiff: Mary B. Johnson and Mary B Johnson PhD
Defendant: Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The and Bowen Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Bowen Center, filed by Mary B Johnson PhD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #4 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(Bolinger, Samuel)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft's unopposed #19 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 8/14/2019 at 11:00 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order.(mr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference of August 7, 2019 by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Bolinger, Samuel)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 8/9/19 to file the amended complaint and exhibits (DE 16-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/2/19. (nal)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Bowen Center re #16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages (Notice of No Objection) (Steinhofer, Rachel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Exhibits)(Bolinger, Samuel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's unopposed #14 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order.(mr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference of July 29, 2019 by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Bolinger, Samuel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #12 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Dft granted to and including 8/2/2019 to file an Answer to Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendant Bowen Center. (Stites, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stites, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney and Client. (Stites, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bowen Center. (Stites, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 6/20/2019. (lns)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Bowen Center ; answer due by 07/19/2019. (Steinhofer, Rachel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
June 17, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The (Steinhofer, Rachel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The (Stites, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3922659.) from Allen Circuit Court, Cause No. 02C01-1905-PL-000187, filed by Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stites, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bowen Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowen Center
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B Johnson PhD
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?