Robinson v. International Paper Company
Plaintiff: Leeya Robinson
Defendant: International Paper Company
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00269
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Caitlin Schroeder. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 4/9/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Schroeder to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Myers. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/14/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Padgett, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by International Paper Company.(Padgett, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin S Schroeder on behalf of International Paper Company (Schroeder, Caitlin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company. (Padgett, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Padgett on behalf of International Paper Company (Padgett, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3926369.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-1905-CT-000264, filed by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Padgett, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeya Robinson
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Caitlin S Schroeder
Represented By: Michael W Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?