Abercrombie v. PPG Coating Services
Plaintiff: Shawn Abercrombie
Defendant: PPG Coating Services d/b/a Crown Group and PPG Coating Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00272
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Shawn Abercrombie. (Myers, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Based on the filing of the #8 Notice of Resolution, parties are to file dismissal papers by 8/19/2019. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 11:00 am is VACATED. Text entry order.(mr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement / Resolution by Shawn Abercrombie (Myers, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPG Coating Services identifying Corporate Parent PPG Industries Inc, Corporate Parent CG Holdings Manufacturing Co, Corporate Parent The Crown Group Co for PPG Coating Services.. (Black, Bianca)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by PPG Coating Services ; answer due by July 26, 2019. (Black, Bianca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant rep. to attend.(mr)
June 24, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L Connor on behalf of PPG Coating Services d/b/a Crown Group (Connor, Emily)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3930016.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1905-CT-000291, filed by PPG Coating Services d/b/a Crown Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, Complaint, Summons, Appearances & Order Setting Case Management Conference, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Bianca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abercrombie v. PPG Coating Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Coating Services d/b/a Crown Group
Represented By: Emily L Connor
Represented By: Bianca V Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Coating Services
Represented By: Emily L Connor
Represented By: Bianca V Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Abercrombie
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?