Pedroza v. FXI
Plaintiff: Lily Pedroza
Defendant: FXI and FXI Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00303
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jennifer Hitchcock. Dft appeared by attys Robert Seidler and Aaron Williamson. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 2/28/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Hitchcock to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Seidler and Williamson. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/4/2019. Pla orally consents to Magistrate Judge on the record.(FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #11 Motion to Withdraw is granted. The appearance of Attorney Christopher C Myers is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Pla. Text entry order. (mr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Lily Pedroza. (Myers, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Seidler, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Lily Pedroza (Hitchcock, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
July 10, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by FXI.(Seidler, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FXI identifying Corporate Parent FXI Holdings for FXI.. (Seidler, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J Williamson on behalf of FXI (Williamson, Aaron)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Seidler on behalf of FXI (Seidler, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3944650.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1906-CT-000335, filed by FXI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seidler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedroza v. FXI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FXI
Represented By: Robert F Seidler
Represented By: Aaron J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FXI Inc.
Represented By: Robert F Seidler
Represented By: Aaron J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Pedroza
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Jennifer L Hitchcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?