Black v. Friedrichsen et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Black
Defendant: Morris Kelsey, Interstate Realty Management Co, Erika Holiday, Hunters Run Apartments and Owners and Naomi Friedrichsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00307
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Naomi Friedrichsen, Erika Holiday, Hunters Run Apartments and Owners, Interstate Realty Management Co. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS) (lns)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned from Sandra Black as Undeliverable - #3 Order. Resent order and copy of docket sheet to 1408 South Maple Street. (nal)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Naomi Friedrichsen, Erika Holiday (Liddick), Hunter's Run Apartment and Interstate Reality Management Co. (Copy mailed to defendants). Waiver of Service due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint). (nal)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case, GRANTS Sandra Black's request to dismiss Morris Kelsey from this lawsuit ECF #1 at #4 , DISMISSES Morris Kelsey without prejudice and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at on Naomi Friedrichsen, Erika Holiday (Liddick), and Hunter's Run Apartment at 707 E. Hunter's Run Apt, Marion, IN 46953, DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at on Interstate Reality Management Co. at 3 East Stow Road, Suite 100, Marlton, NJ 08053-0994. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/12/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
July 10, 2019 Remark - Case opened per order in case 1:19cv222 at DE 6. No summons or USM forms attached. Copy of docket sheet sent to pro se party). (nal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sandra Black. (nal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Naomi Friedrichsen, Erika Holiday, Hunters Run Apartments and Owners, Interstate Realty Management Co and Morris Kelsey filed by Sandra Black. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Friedrichsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Realty Management Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Run Apartments and Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Friedrichsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?