Hogue v. Avancez, LLC
Plaintiff: James O. Hogue
Defendant: Avancez, LLC d/b/a Android-Fort Wayne, LLC and Avancez, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00310
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Avancez, LLC.(Lemert, Martha)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Atty Cathy Serrano appeared on behalf of the Pla. Pla appeared telephonically. Dft appeared by atty Martha Lemert and Andrea Bouchard, Labor and Employment Manager. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 4/10/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Lemert to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Serrano. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/11/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of James O. Hogue (Serrano, Cathy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Avancez, LLC of Attorney Certification to Client of Fees and Expenses (Lemert, Martha)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avancez, LLC. (Lemert, Martha)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Avancez, LLC (Mulholland, Shane)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #6 Plaintiff's Motion to be Excused from Attending the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. Plaintiff granted leave to attend the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:30 am via telephonically. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 23, 2019 Answer due date reset to 8/22/2019 pursuant to #7 Agreed Notice. (sct)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Avancez, LLC ; answer due by 08/22/2019. (Lemert, Martha)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Excuse Plaintiff from Attending PPTC by Plaintiff James O. Hogue. (Myers, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff and Dft rep. to attend.(mr)
July 15, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Avancez, LLC d/b/a Android-Fort Wayne, LLC (Lemert, Martha)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3948744.) from Huntington Superior Court, Cause No. 35D01-1906-CT-000501, filed by Avancez, LLC d/b/a Android-Fort Wayne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings and docket)(Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogue v. Avancez, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O. Hogue
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avancez, LLC d/b/a Android-Fort Wayne, LLC
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avancez, LLC
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Represented By: Shane C Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?