Cartwright v. PAH Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Michelle C Cartwright
Defendant: PAH Management, LLC d/b/a Hilton Garden Inn Fort Wayne and PAH Management, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00311
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAH Management, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Shane Mulholland. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 5/19/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Myers to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Mulholland. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/9/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mulholland, Shane)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by PAH Management, LLC.(Lepley, Lindsay)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of PAH Management, LLC (Mulholland, Shane)
July 15, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Hurni Lepley on behalf of PAH Management, LLC d/b/a Hilton Garden Inn Fort Wayne (Lepley, Lindsay)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3948891.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-1905-CT-000313, filed by PAH Management, LLC d/b/a Hilton Garden Inn Fort Wayne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Lepley, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartwright v. PAH Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle C Cartwright
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAH Management, LLC d/b/a Hilton Garden Inn Fort Wayne
Represented By: Lindsay Hurni Lepley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAH Management, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Hurni Lepley
Represented By: Shane C Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?