Wilkerson v. Fort Wayne International Airport et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie J. Wilkerson and Stephanie J Wilkerson
Defendant: Fort Wayne International Airport, Republic Parking System, LLC and Republic Parking Systems
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00312
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dfts appeared by attys Ashley Gilbert-Johnson and Shelley McCoy. The #18 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 4/15/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Gilbert-Johnson and McCoy. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/9/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Stephanie J Wilkerson (Serrano, Cathy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Storer, Theodore)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Republic Parking Systems.(McCoy, Shelley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic Parking Systems identifying Corporate Parent Imperial Parking, LLC for Republic Parking Systems.. (McCoy, Shelley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Fort Wayne International Airport.(Storer, Theodore)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
July 22, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #12 Fort Wayne International Airport answer due 8/12/2019. (rmc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Fort Wayne International Airport of Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Storer, Theodore)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Republic Parking Systems. Amendment to #5 Notice of Appearance . (McCoy, Shelley)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Republic Parking Systems. Amendment to #4 Notice of Appearance . (McDermott, Dorothy)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant Republic Parking System answer due 8/12/2019 per #6 Agreed Notice. (jld)
July 16, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Fort Wayne International Airport. Amendment to #3 Notice of Appearance . (Gilbert-Johnson, Ashley)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Fort Wayne International Airport. Amendment to #2 Notice of Appearance by Theodore T. Storer to change fax number. (Storer, Theodore)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Republic Parking System, LLC ; answer due by August 12, 2019. (McDermott, Dorothy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley R McCoy on behalf of Republic Parking System, LLC (McCoy, Shelley) FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT AT DE#11 Modified on 7/23/2019 (ace).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy D McDermott on behalf of Republic Parking System, LLC (McDermott, Dorothy) FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT AT DE#10 Modified on 7/23/2019 (ace).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley M Gilbert-Johnson on behalf of Fort Wayne International Airport (Gilbert-Johnson, Ashley) FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT AT DE#8 Modified on 7/23/2019 (ace).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore T Storer on behalf of Fort Wayne International Airport (Storer, Theodore) FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT AT DE#7 Modified on 7/23/2019 (ace).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3949662.) from ALLEN SUPERIOR COURT, Cause No. 02D02-1906-CT-000338, filed by Fort Wayne International Airport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storer, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Fort Wayne International Airport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie J. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie J Wilkerson
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Wayne International Airport
Represented By: Theodore T Storer
Represented By: Ashley M Gilbert-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Parking System, LLC
Represented By: Dorothy D McDermott
Represented By: Shelley R McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Parking Systems
Represented By: Dorothy D McDermott
Represented By: Shelley R McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?