Reese v. General Motors Corp LLC
Plaintiff: Malinda Reese
Defendant: General Motors Corp LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00320
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 10/28/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff).(mr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Malinda Reese. (mrm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Correction of Defendant's Name by Plaintiff Malinda Reese. (mrm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 a 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #8 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Dft granted to and including 9/17/2019 to file Answer to #1 Complaint. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Defendant General Motors Corp LLC. (Foster, Tiaundra)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors Corp LLC. (Foster, Tiaundra)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra M Foster on behalf of General Motors Corp LLC (Foster, Tiaundra)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L Martin on behalf of General Motors Corp LLC (Martin, Bonnie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malinda Reese. General Motors Corp LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (green card undated) (mrm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Malinda Reese. (mrm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to General Motors Corp, LLC filed by Malinda Reese. (mrm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against General Motors Corp LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00.pd Receipt #INN1010298), filed by Malinda M Reese. Copy of case with case # given to pro se party.(mrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. General Motors Corp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corp LLC
Represented By: Tiaundra M Foster
Represented By: Bonnie L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?