Ehlerding v. DSG Indiana, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Ehlerding
Defendant: DSG Indiana, LLC, Austin Mills and Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00349
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #17 Dft's Motion to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference was filed in incorrect case, and therefore stricken. Text entry order.The (mr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 ** STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DE 18 ** MOTION to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas) Modified on 10/3/2019 (mr).
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Austin Mills' ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Austin Mills.(Mulholland, Shane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Austin Mills (Mulholland, Shane)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/18/2019. (lns)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc..(Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Ehlerding. Austin Mills served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Haskin, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Ehlerding. Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Haskin, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Austin Mills. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and jury demand against Austin Mills, Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc., filed by Jason Ehlerding. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Wilson, Keenan) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add jury demand(kjp).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DSG Indiana, LLC, Austin Mills. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
August 13, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keenan D Wilson on behalf of Jason Ehlerding (Wilson, Keenan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Jason Ehlerding (Haskin, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3974450.), filed by Jason Ehlerding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ehlerding v. DSG Indiana, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ehlerding
Represented By: Keenan D Wilson
Represented By: John H Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSG Indiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Mills
Represented By: Shane C Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klopfenstein Homerooms Furniture Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?