Hughes-Rodriguez v. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez
Defendant: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00359
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plaintiff appeared pro se. Atty Kristy Kopaczewski appeared on behalf of Defendant. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Initial disclosures are due by 10/31/2019. Deadline for Plaintiff to seek leave to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 11/26/2019, and deadline for Defendant is 12/10/2019. Deadline for Plaintiff to disclose Rule 26(a)(2) witness and witness report is 12/10/2019, and deadline for Defendant is 1/2/2020. Deadline for completion of all discovery is 4/6/2020. Maximum of 25 interrogatories and maximum of 30 requests for admission by each party to other party. Maximum of 10 depositions by each party, and limited to a maximum of 7 hours each. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/29/2019. Parties are to contact the Court when they are ready to proceed with a judicial settlement conference. Court grants Defendant's unopposed #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant granted to and including 10/31/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez. (bas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kopaczewski, Kristy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez. (bas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/30/19. (kjp)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Kopaczewski, Kristy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Kopaczewski, Kristy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 9/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plaintiff appeared pro se. Atty Kristy Kopaczewski appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft. Atty Kopaczewski advises discovery plan was not filed as she was unable to contact Plaintiff. Plaintiff provides updated contact information. Court orders Parties to prepare and file a joint proposed discovery plan. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is reset for 10/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Plaintiff to appear in person. Atty Kopaczewski to appear telephonically, with Court to initiate call. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to UAW Local 2209 by Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez.(bas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to Caravan Facilities Management by Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez.(bas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff) (mr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC.(Kopaczewski, Kristy)
August 19, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3980226.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1907-CT-000407, filed by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kopaczewski, Kristy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes-Rodriguez v. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Represented By: Kristy M Kopaczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Hughes-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?