Zinkie v. Staud Cycles
Plaintiff: David Zinkie
Defendant: Staud Cycles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00375
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Staud Cycles. (Keen, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Staud Cycles (Keen, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Zinkie. Staud Cycles served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Crossen, Trevor)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Staud Cycles. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
August 27, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J Crossen on behalf of David Zinkie (Crossen, Trevor)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Staud Cycles( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3988114.), filed by David Zinkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Crossen, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zinkie v. Staud Cycles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staud Cycles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zinkie
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?