Camacho et al v. BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gricelda Sanchez, Esther Madrigal, Cristy Camacho, Guadalupe Estrada, Lorena Madrigal, Reyna Regalado, Susana Guajardo, Carmen Regalado, Olga Puebla and Victoria Villagomez
Defendant: BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by atty Thomas Kimbrough. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Discovery deadline is 11/13/2020. Dispositive motion deadline is 12/4/2020. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/12/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Serrano, Cathy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #8 Dft's Motion to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 10/22/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Text entry order.(mr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person. (mr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/18/2019. (lns)
September 11, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc..(Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4002325.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1909-CT-000485, filed by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaints)(Kimbrough, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho et al v. BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gricelda Sanchez
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Madrigal
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristy Camacho
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Estrada
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Madrigal
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyna Regalado
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Guajardo
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Regalado
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Puebla
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Villagomez
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?