Prince v. Allen County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Corey Prince
Defendant: Allen County Board of Commissioners and Brittany Barron
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00393
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss ECF No. #14 and this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/30/19. (nal)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss - Unopposed by Plaintiff Corey Prince. (Myers, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dfts appeared by atty Laura Maser. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Discovery deadline is 8/3/2020. Dispositive motions deadline is 9/4/2020. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Maser. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/12/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Corey Prince (Serrano, Cathy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Corey Prince (Myers, Christopher)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 10/22/2019 at 10:00 am in US District Court. Text entry order.(mr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Allen County Board of Commissioners, Brittany Barron.(Maser, Laura)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr)
September 11, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allen County Board of Commissioners, Brittany Barron Civil Cover Sheet (Maser, Laura)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L Maser on behalf of Allen County Board of Commissioners, Brittany Barron (Maser, Laura)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4002847.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1907-CT-423, filed by Brittany Barron, Allen County Board of Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Filings)(Maser, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Allen County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Laura L Maser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Barron
Represented By: Laura L Maser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Prince
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?