Maggart v. Park Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Maggart
Defendant: Park Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re #10 Stipulation to Dismiss. (cer)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 am is vacated in light of the filing of the #10 Stipulation to Dismiss. The #8 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is deemed moot. Text entry order.(mr)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Amanda Maggart. (Myers, Christopher)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant Park Center, Inc.. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Park Center, Inc..(Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of Park Center, Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DENIES the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , GRANTS the Plaintiff until 10/24/2019 to pay the $400.00 filing fee, and CAUTIONS the Plaintiff if there is no response by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/19/2019. (rmf)
September 17, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING) (mlc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amanda Maggart. (Myers, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Park Center, Inc., filed by Amanda Maggart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons USM285)(Myers, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maggart v. Park Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Maggart
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Center, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?