Foster v. DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC
Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Defendant: DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC
Not Yet Classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00398
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Owen Dunn. Dft appeared by atty Thomas Kimbrough. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 8/1/2020. Deadline for filing dispositive motions is 9/15/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Kimbrough to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Dunn. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/3/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dunn, Owen)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 10/1/2019. (lns)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC.(Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
September 18, 2019 **NEW CASE** Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4009758.), filed by Leland Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dunn, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Represented By: Owen B Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT PLACE - JM, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?