Gravelle v. Avis Industrial Corporation
Plaintiff: Gordon Gravelle
Defendant: Avis Industrial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00409
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiff) (mr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held on 11/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared pro se. Dft appeared by atty Thomas Kimbrough. Subject matter jurisdiction discussed. Court find subject matter jurisdiction established. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se plaintiff) (mr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Gordon Gravelle. Avis Industrial Corporation served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (bas)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #12 Plaintiff's Request to Appear via Phone for Hearing on 11/14/2019 at 2:00 pm is granted. Court to initiate call. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Plaintiffs' Request to Appear via Phone for Hearing Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Diversity) by Plaintiff Gordon Gravelle. (mrm)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #10 Dft's Request to Appear via Cell Phone for Hearing Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction on 11/14/2019 at 2:00 pm is granted. Court will initiate call. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiff) (mr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Cell Phone for November 14, 2019 Telephonic Hearing by Defendant Avis Industrial Corporation. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: A telephonic hearing regarding subject matter jurisdiction (diversity) is set for 11/14/2019 at 2:00 PM (EST) in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #6 Dft's Request for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is deemed moot as Dft has filed an #7 Answer to the Complaint within the initial deadline. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiff) (mr)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Avis Industrial Corporation.(Kimbrough, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Avis Industrial Corporation. (Kimbrough, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of Avis Industrial Corporation (Kimbrough, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Avis Industrial Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USM) (ksp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the Plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the Clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at Avis Industrial Corporation, 1909 South Main St., P.O. Box 548, Upland, Indiana 46989. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/30/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party and USM)(ksp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gordon Gravelle. (bas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Avis Industrial Corporation, filed by Gordon Gravelle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope)(bas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gravelle v. Avis Industrial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Gravelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Industrial Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?