Smyser v. MTD Products Company et al
Plaintiff: Laura Smyser
Defendant: MTD Consumer Group Inc., Briggs & Stratton Corporation and MTD Products Company
Not Classified By Court: John Whiteleather
Case Number: 1:2019cv00482
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING, APPROVING and ADOPTING as an Order of this Court #36 Motion for Protective Order, as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/26/2020. (lhc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company. (Holdsworth, Peter)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The filing of 34 MTD Products Company and MTD Consumer Group Inc's Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure is in violation of N.D. Ind. L.R. 26-2(a)(1)(H) and is hereby STRICKEN. Text entry order.(mr)
January 24, 2020 Filing 33 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Briggs & Stratton Corporation.(Keen, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/14/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 1/15/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 9/30/2020; and from defendant(s) by 10/30/2020. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings is 5/4/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 2/16/2021 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) & (c). The parties have selected John Whiteleather as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/15/2020. (mrm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by attys Albert Dahm and Sarah Reser. Dfts appeared by attys Peter Holdsworth, Brandon Cross, Jeffrey Soble, and Robert Keen. The #28 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. John Whiteleather appointed as Mediator. Atty Dahm to notify Mediator by letter, copy to all counsel. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/5/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
January 15, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Kroft on behalf of MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company (Kroft, Brandon)
January 14, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company identifying Corporate Parent MTD Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Stanley Black & Decker Inc for MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company.. (Gilbert, Heather)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dahm, Albert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Briggs & Stratton Corporation. (Keen, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Briggs & Stratton Corporation.(Keen, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Holdsworth on behalf of MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company (Holdsworth, Peter)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey A Soble PHV for Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/6/2020. (ace)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 Application for Attorney Jeffrey A. Soble to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4106038(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2020: #1 Federal Court Admissions) (ace).
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hayley L Altabef PHV for Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/2/2020. (ace)
December 30, 2019 Filing 21 Application for Attorney Hayley L. Altabef to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4103588(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company.(Gilbert, Heather)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lori L Taylor PHV for Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 12/23/2019. (ace)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Lori Lynn Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4099928(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (mr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company.(Gilbert, Heather)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather T Gilbert on behalf of MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company (Gilbert, Heather)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The deadline for Dft, Briggs & Stratton Corporation to respond to Pla's Complaint is extended to and including 1/9/2020. Text entry order.(mr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Briggs & Stratton Corporation. (Keen, Robert)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Keen, Jr on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation (Keen, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Smyser. Briggs & Stratton Corporation served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Reser, Sarah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Smyser. MTD Consumer Group Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Reser, Sarah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Smyser. MTD Products Company served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Reser, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Laura Smyser, #6 Order, Set Deadlines. (Dahm, Albert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 11/25/2019 to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/18/2019. (jat)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Reser on behalf of Laura Smyser (Reser, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Briggs & Stratton Corporation, MTD Consumer Group Inc., MTD Products Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 MTD / CT Corporation, #2 MTD Products)(nae) Modified on 11/18/2019 (nae).
November 18, 2019 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert J Dahm on behalf of Laura Smyser (Dahm, Albert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert J Dahm on behalf of Laura Smyser (Dahm, Albert) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #5 *** Modified on 11/18/2019 (ace).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4066672.), filed by Laura Smyser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons MTD Products, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons MTD Consumer Group, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Briggs & Stratton)(Dahm, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smyser v. MTD Products Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD Consumer Group Inc.
Represented By: Heather T Gilbert
Represented By: Peter A Holdsworth
Represented By: Brandon J Kroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Represented By: Robert T Keen, Jr
Represented By: Hayley L Altabef PHV
Represented By: Lori L Taylor PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey A Soble PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD Products Company
Represented By: Heather T Gilbert
Represented By: Peter A Holdsworth
Represented By: Brandon J Kroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Smyser
Represented By: Albert J Dahm
Represented By: Sarah E Reser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: John Whiteleather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?