Jones v. Parkview Hospital, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erica Y Jones
Defendant: Parkview Hospital, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2020cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Hospital, Inc..(Lemert, Martha)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/24/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/18/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 7/17/2020; and from defendant(s) by 8/17/2020. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 3/16/2020 and for Defendant is 3/30/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/19/2020. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. The presiding judge will hold a status conference to set a final pretrial conference and trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/5/2020. (mrm)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by attys Martha Lemert and Marie Kolp. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Lemert to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Serrano. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/25/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (#FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Hospital, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Parkview Health Systems, Inc. for Parkview Hospital, Inc... (Lemert, Martha)
January 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #4 Parkview Hospital, Inc. answer due 2/7/2020. (nae)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Hospital, Inc. ; answer due by February 7, 2020. (Lemert, Martha)
January 6, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Parkview Hospital, Inc. (Lemert, Martha)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4105812.) from Allen Superior Court No. 3, Cause No. 02D03-1912-CT-000641, filed by Parkview Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court filings/orders and docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Parkview Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Y Jones
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?