Adam v. D & W Fine Pack
Plaintiff: Jessie A Adam
Defendant: D & W Fine Pack, Janet Pierre, Renard Hollard and Nemeih Slaughter
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, Janet Pierre, Nemeih Slaughter and Renard Hollard filed by Jessie A Adam. No proposed summons filed. (nal)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to amend ECF #13 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to show Plaintiff's amended complaint ECF #14 and its exhibits ECF [14-1] and [14-2] as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/25/20. (nal)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant D&W Fine Pack's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint For Damages by D & W Fine Pack.(Shankman, David)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/5/2020. Discovery deadline is 5/3/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 2/8/2021; and from Defendant by 3/8/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due by 4/6/2021. Amended pleadings deadline as to Plaintiff is 5/1/2020; as to Defendant is 6/1/2020. Dispositive motions deadline is 6/3/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response. The parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternate dispute resolution with mediator Anthony Stites, as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/12/2020. (lhc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 16 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Samuel Bolinger. Dft appeared by atty Allison Wallrapp-McMullan. Dft has no objection to Pla's #13 Motion to Amend Complaint. Pla anticipates filing a Second Motion to Amend Complaint. The #12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved, as amended, in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/4/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) Modified on 2/12/2020 to add language (mr).
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE Attorney - Client Certification. (Bolinger, Samuel)
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, filed by Jessie A Adam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bolinger, Samuel) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jld).
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Jessie A Adam. (Bolinger, Samuel)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Shankman on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Shankman, David)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; REFILED AT #11 *** Modified on 2/6/2020 (ace).
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Shankman on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Shankman, David) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; REFILED AT #10 *** Modified on 2/6/2020 (ace).
January 13, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 2/10/2020 per #7 Agreed Notice. (jld)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by D & W Fine Pack ; answer due by February 10, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 7, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D & W Fine Pack. (Mortimer, Renee)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Mortimer, Renee)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4108192.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1912-PL-000470, filed by D & W Fine Pack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam v. D & W Fine Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & W Fine Pack
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Represented By: Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan
Represented By: David S Shankman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renard Hollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemeih Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie A Adam
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?