Herron v. Lutheran Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darah L. Herron
Defendant: Lutheran Homes, Inc. d/b/a Lutheran Life Villages and Lutheran Homes, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2020cv00014
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Darah L. Herron. (Serrano, Cathy)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/10/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 1/8/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 7/24/2020; and from defendant(s) by 8/21/2020. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff 5/8/2020; as to Defendant is 6/8/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 3/19/2021. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/12/2020. (mrm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/11/2020 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by atty Gary Johnson. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/3/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (#FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Darah L. Herron (Serrano, Cathy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Lutheran Homes, Inc..(Johnson, Gary)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lutheran Homes, Inc.. (Johnson, Gary)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 9, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Lutheran Homes, Inc. d/b/a Lutheran Life Villages ; answer due by February 10, 2020. (Johnson, Gary)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D Johnson on behalf of Lutheran Homes, Inc. d/b/a Lutheran Life Villages (Johnson, Gary)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4110321.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1912-CT-000668, filed by Lutheran Homes, Inc. d/b/a Lutheran Life Villages. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Appearance, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Motion to Waive Filing Fee, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Service Issued by Clerk, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Service Issued by Clerk, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Order Setting CMC, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - Service Returned Served, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Service Returned Served)(Johnson, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. Lutheran Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Homes, Inc. d/b/a Lutheran Life Villages
Represented By: Gary D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Gary D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darah L. Herron
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?