Green v. Wildwood Investment Properties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Billy Green
Defendant: Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC and Brad Pepple
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brad Pepple, Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC; answer due by 6/19/2020, per #7 . (lhc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Appel on behalf of All Defendants (Appel, Christopher)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC. (Andres, Scott)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Brad Pepple, Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC ; answer due by June 19, 2020. (Andres, Scott)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Andres on behalf of All Defendants (Andres, Scott)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen M Dane PHV for Billy Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/8/2020. (ace)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Stephen Dane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Billy Green. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4187012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brad Pepple, Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
March 30, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. Plaintiff seeks injunctive relief. (kjp)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Clark on behalf of Billy Green (Clark, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Brad Pepple, Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4184750.), filed by Billy Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for Brad Pepple)(Clark, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Wildwood Investment Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildwood Investment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Scott E Andres
Represented By: Christopher J Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Pepple
Represented By: Scott E Andres
Represented By: Christopher J Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Green
Represented By: Christopher E Clark
Represented By: Stephen M Dane PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?