Asher et al v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cory Feltner, Anna Standafer, Alex Powell, Judith Wallace, Myrtle Young, Leota Hampton, Cyndi Ross, Mark Oppy, Jr., Bill Nichols, Tammy Eddingfield, Roxanne Gray, David Smith, Becky Howard, Randy Shively, Damian Shepherd, Tim Davis, Melinda Marshall, Dave Hysong, Don Keel, Jeff Marshall, Linda Phillips, Glenn Fisher, Annette Oppy, Annette Shively, Jade Johnson, Chelsi Straka, Gerald Hampton, Deanna Kochensparger, Joshua Keel, Michael Slone, Lance Gray, Valerie Nichols, Lucas Roberts, Selnia Feltner, Sara Slone, Tammera Hysong, Mark Oppy, Mark Walters, Dick Reed, Kristen Helvie, Paula Blair, Brenda Roberson, Vickie Baker, Estalene Chappel, James Kenny Sollars, Raymond Tackett, Pamela Tackett, Kayla Young, Melinda Roberts, Janice Harshbarger, Paxten Daggett, Joe Davis, Town of Andrews, Indiana, Allie Feltner, Tina Oppy, Jane Clark, Carla Brane, Russell Wallace, Brandon Standafer, Ethan Straka, Karen Houlihan, Edmond Asher, Maddox Adams, Sharon Rainwater, Eric Chappel, Rachel Kochensparger, Dan Kochensparger, Carole Keller, Tina Bradley, John Harshbarger, Ashly Kochensparger, Dennis Slone, Haley Standafer, Kelsy Roberts, Angela Feltner and Larry Rainwater
Defendant: Andrews Dairy Store Inc, Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC, CP Product LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, L.D. Williams, Inc. and LDW Development LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00238
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #8 the Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand; DENYING the Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs; and DENYING AS MOOT #12 Defendants' Motion to Sever and Consolidate. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Huntington Superior Court consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 6/30/2020. (bas) (Certified copies of this order and docket sheet mailed to Huntington Superior Court) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bas).
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth M Thomas on behalf of L.D. Williams, Inc., LDW Development LLC (Thomas, Seth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M McNeil on behalf of L.D. Williams, Inc., LDW Development LLC (McNeil, Andrew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Sugarman on behalf of L.D. Williams, Inc., LDW Development LLC (Sugarman, Bradley)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Sugarman on behalf of L.D. Williams, Inc., LDW Development LLC (Sugarman, Bradley) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #17 *** Modified on 6/30/2020 (ace).
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Sever Injunctive Relief Claim and Consolidate with Millman-Powell filed by Maddox Adams, Edmond Asher, Vickie Baker, Paula Blair, Tina Bradley, Carla Brane, Eric Chappel, Estalene Chappel, Jane Clark, Paxten Daggett, Joe Davis, Tim Davis, Tammy Eddingfield, Allie Feltner, Angela Feltner, Cory Feltner, Selnia Feltner, Glenn Fisher, Lance Gray, Roxanne Gray, Gerald Hampton, Leota Hampton, Janice Harshbarger, John Harshbarger, Kristen Helvie, Karen Houlihan, Becky Howard, Dave Hysong, Tammera Hysong, Jade Johnson, Don Keel, Joshua Keel, Carole Keller, Ashly Kochensparger, Dan Kochensparger, Deanna Kochensparger, Rachel Kochensparger, Jeff Marshall, Melinda Marshall, Bill Nichols, Valerie Nichols, Annette Oppy, Mark Oppy, Mark Oppy, Jr, Tina Oppy, Linda Phillips, Alex Powell, Larry Rainwater, Sharon Rainwater, Dick Reed, Brenda Roberson, Kelsy Roberts, Lucas Roberts, Melinda Roberts, Cyndi Ross, Damian Shepherd, Annette Shively, Randy Shively, Dennis Slone, Michael Slone, Sara Slone, David Smith, James Kenny Sollars, Anna Standafer, Brandon Standafer, Haley Standafer, Chelsi Straka, Ethan Straka, Pamela Tackett, Raymond Tackett, Town of Andrews, Indiana, Judith Wallace, Russell Wallace, Mark Walters, Kayla Young, Myrtle Young. (Barnard, Thomas)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Maddox Adams, Edmond Asher, Vickie Baker, Paula Blair, Tina Bradley, Carla Brane, Eric Chappel, Estalene Chappel, Jane Clark, Paxten Daggett, Joe Davis, Tim Davis, Tammy Eddingfield, Allie Feltner, Angela Feltner, Cory Feltner, Selnia Feltner, Glenn Fisher, Lance Gray, Roxanne Gray, Gerald Hampton, Leota Hampton, Janice Harshbarger, John Harshbarger, Kristen Helvie, Karen Houlihan, Becky Howard, Dave Hysong, Tammera Hysong, Jade Johnson, Don Keel, Joshua Keel, Carole Keller, Ashly Kochensparger, Dan Kochensparger, Deanna Kochensparger, Rachel Kochensparger, Jeff Marshall, Melinda Marshall, Bill Nichols, Valerie Nichols, Annette Oppy, Mark Oppy, Mark Oppy, Jr, Tina Oppy, Linda Phillips, Alex Powell, Larry Rainwater, Sharon Rainwater, Dick Reed, Brenda Roberson, Kelsy Roberts, Lucas Roberts, Melinda Roberts, Cyndi Ross, Damian Shepherd, Annette Shively, Randy Shively, Dennis Slone, Michael Slone, Sara Slone, David Smith, James Kenny Sollars, Anna Standafer, Brandon Standafer, Haley Standafer, Chelsi Straka, Ethan Straka, Pamela Tackett, Raymond Tackett, Town of Andrews, Indiana, Judith Wallace, Russell Wallace, Mark Walters, Kayla Young, Myrtle Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1. 2020-06-24 Letter from IDEM, #2 Exhibit #2. 2020-06-27 Sampling Results)(Barnard, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sever Injunctive Relief Claim and Consolidate with Millman-Powell filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - J. Baron Letter to Town, #3 Exhibit B - Town of Andrews Letter to IDEM, #4 Exhibit C - Strand Utility Master Plan, #5 Exhibit D - Letter from IDEM to Andrews Water Dpt., #6 Exhibit E - Letter to Andrews Fire Chief, #7 Exhibit F - Town of Andrews Responses to Interrogatories)(Eaton, Joseph)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever Injunctive Relief Claim and Consolidate with Millman-Powell by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Eaton, Joseph)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR JUDGE HOLLY A BRADY: Defendants to file a Response to Plaintiffs' #8 Emergency Motion to Remand by end of day 6/26/2020. Plaintiffs to file a Reply by noon 6/29/2020. (cer)
June 25, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added (NEW CASE; EMERGENCY MOTION PENDING). (ksp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Maddox Adams, Edmond Asher, Vickie Baker, Paula Blair, Tina Bradley, Carla Brane, Eric Chappel, Estalene Chappel, Jane Clark, Paxten Daggett, Joe Davis, Tim Davis, Tammy Eddingfield, Allie Feltner, Angela Feltner, Cory Feltner, Selnia Feltner, Glenn Fisher, Lance Gray, Roxanne Gray, Gerald Hampton, Leota Hampton, Janice Harshbarger, John Harshbarger, Kristen Helvie, Karen Houlihan, Becky Howard, Dave Hysong, Tammera Hysong, Jade Johnson, Don Keel, Joshua Keel, Carole Keller, Ashly Kochensparger, Dan Kochensparger, Deanna Kochensparger, Rachel Kochensparger, Jeff Marshall, Melinda Marshall, Bill Nichols, Valerie Nichols, Annette Oppy, Mark Oppy, Mark Oppy, Jr, Tina Oppy, Linda Phillips, Alex Powell, Larry Rainwater, Sharon Rainwater, Dick Reed, Brenda Roberson, Kelsy Roberts, Lucas Roberts, Melinda Roberts, Cyndi Ross, Damian Shepherd, Annette Shively, Randy Shively, Dennis Slone, Michael Slone, Sara Slone, David Smith, James Kenny Sollars, Anna Standafer, Brandon Standafer, Haley Standafer, Chelsi Straka, Ethan Straka, Pamela Tackett, Raymond Tackett, Town of Andrews, Indiana, Judith Wallace, Russell Wallace, Mark Walters, Kayla Young, Myrtle Young. (Barnard, Thomas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Maddox Adams, Edmond Asher, Vickie Baker, Paula Blair, Tina Bradley, Carla Brane, Eric Chappel, Estalene Chappel, Jane Clark, Paxten Daggett, Joe Davis, Tim Davis, Tammy Eddingfield, Allie Feltner, Angela Feltner, Cory Feltner, Selnia Feltner, Glenn Fisher, Lance Gray, Roxanne Gray, Gerald Hampton, Leota Hampton, Janice Harshbarger, John Harshbarger, Kristen Helvie, Karen Houlihan, Becky Howard, Dave Hysong, Tammera Hysong, Jade Johnson, Don Keel, Joshua Keel, Carole Keller, Ashly Kochensparger, Dan Kochensparger, Deanna Kochensparger, Rachel Kochensparger, Jeff Marshall, Melinda Marshall, Bill Nichols, Valerie Nichols, Annette Oppy, Mark Oppy, Mark Oppy, Jr, Tina Oppy, Linda Phillips, Alex Powell, Larry Rainwater, Sharon Rainwater, Dick Reed, Brenda Roberson, Kelsy Roberts, Lucas Roberts, Melinda Roberts, Cyndi Ross, Damian Shepherd, Annette Shively, Randy Shively, Dennis Slone, Michael Slone, Sara Slone, David Smith, James Kenny Sollars, Anna Standafer, Brandon Standafer, Haley Standafer, Chelsi Straka, Ethan Straka, Pamela Tackett, Raymond Tackett, Town of Andrews, Indiana, Judith Wallace, Russell Wallace, Mark Walters, Kayla Young, Myrtle Young. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit #1. Asher State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit #2. Verified Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit #3 [Part 1 of 4]. 2020-06-19 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit #3 [Part 2 of 4]. 2020-06-19 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit #3 [Part 3 of 4]. 2020-06-19 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Exhibit #3 [Part 4 of 4]. 2020-06-19 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Exhibit #4. 2020-06-24 Affidavit of James T. Wells, Ph.D., #9 Exhibit #5. 2020-06-24 Affidavit of John Harshbarger, #10 Exhibit #6. 2020-06-24 Affidavit of Thomas Wuensch, #11 Exhibit #7. 2020-06-23. Notice of Hearing)(Barnard, Thomas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A Wolowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolowski, Benjamin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney L Michael, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michael, Rodney)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Barnard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnard, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra Reichard on behalf of CP Product LLC, Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Reichard, Alejandra)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CP Product LLC, Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Raytheon Technologies Corporation for Raytheon Technologies Corporation ; Corporate Parent Lear Operations Corporation for Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC; Corporate Parent Dana Companies LLC, Other Affiliate Enstar Holding (US) Inc for CP Product LLC.. (Eaton, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Eaton on behalf of CP Product LLC, Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Eaton, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4262441.) from Huntington Superior Court, Cause No. 35D01-2006-CT-000338, filed by Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, CP Product LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D Part I, #6 Exhibit D Part II, #7 Exhibit D Part III, #8 Exhibit D Part IV)(Eaton, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asher et al v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Feltner
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Standafer
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Powell
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Wallace
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Young
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leota Hampton
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndi Ross
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Oppy, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Nichols
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Eddingfield
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Gray
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Howard
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Shively
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Shepherd
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Davis
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Marshall
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Hysong
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Keel
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Marshall
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Phillips
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Fisher
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Oppy
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Shively
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Johnson
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsi Straka
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hampton
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Kochensparger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Keel
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Slone
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Gray
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Nichols
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Roberts
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selnia Feltner
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Slone
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammera Hysong
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Oppy
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Walters
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick Reed
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Helvie
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Blair
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Roberson
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Baker
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estalene Chappel
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kenny Sollars
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Tackett
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Tackett
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Young
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Roberts
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Harshbarger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paxten Daggett
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Davis
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Andrews, Indiana
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allie Feltner
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Oppy
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Clark
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Brane
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Wallace
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Standafer
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Straka
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Houlihan
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Asher
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maddox Adams
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Rainwater
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Chappel
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kochensparger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Kochensparger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Keller
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Bradley
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harshbarger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashly Kochensparger
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Slone
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Standafer
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsy Roberts
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Feltner
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rainwater
Represented By: Thomas A Barnard
Represented By: Benjamin A Wolowski
Represented By: Rodney L Michael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews Dairy Store Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation Eeds and Interiors, LLC
Represented By: Alejandra Reichard
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CP Product LLC
Represented By: Alejandra Reichard
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Alejandra Reichard
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Williams, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M McNeil
Represented By: Seth M Thomas
Represented By: Bradley R Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDW Development LLC
Represented By: Andrew M McNeil
Represented By: Seth M Thomas
Represented By: Bradley R Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?