Sholle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James H Sholle
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00262
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo James H Sholle. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/10/2020; U.S. Attorney General served on 8/10/2020; and U.S. Attorney served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020.(bas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(lhc)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the filing fee in this case; and DIRECTING pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of summons on the Defendant(s) at the addresses provided by Plaintiff on the USM-285 forms submitted with his Complaint, together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/17/2020. (lhc) Modified on 7/17/2020 cc: USMS (lhc).
July 15, 2020 Judge William C Lee added. (NEW CASE; IFP MOTION PENDING) (bas)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Fisher on behalf of James H Sholle (Fisher, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (28 U.S.C. 1915) by Plaintiff James H Sholle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM 285)(Fisher, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by James H Sholle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM 285)(Fisher, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sholle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Sholle
Represented By: Jennifer L Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?