Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Justin Hicks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00265
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Justin Hicks. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/10/2020; U.S. Attorney General served on 8/10/2020; and U.S. Attorney served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (bas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy USMS) (mrm)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/24/2020. (cc: USMS) (mrm)
July 23, 2020 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Justin Hicks (Rodman, Jason)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Justin Hicks (Forbes, Randal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Justin Hicks. (Forbes, Randal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Justin Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hicks
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?