Milligan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Connie F Milligan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00266
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joshua P. Kolar for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2. (bas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/8/2020. (tc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Connie F Milligan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/10/2020, US Attorney General served on 8/10/2020 and US Attorney served 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (mrm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy USMS) (mrm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/30/2020) (ksc).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 72/27/2020. (Copy USMS) (mrm) Modified on 7/27/2020 to add routing (mrm).
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING) (mlc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Connie F Milligan (Rodman, Jason)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Connie F Milligan (Forbes, Randal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Connie F Milligan. (Forbes, Randal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Connie F Milligan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milligan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie F Milligan
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?