Albright et al v. Coates et al
Plaintiff: Mark Albright and Stacy Albright
Defendant: Spirit Logistics, Inc., robert coates, Milbank Insurance Company, d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies and Milbank Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Not Classified By Court: Dan Palmer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00307
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 10/23/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 8/27/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiffs by 2/26/2021; and from Defendants by 4/30/2021. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiffs is 1/29/2021; as to Defendants is 2/26/2021. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/27/2021. Parties have agreed upon Dan Palmer as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/2/2020. (mrm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/1/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by atty Thomas Blackburn. Atty Thomas Vetne and Atty Robert Ahlgrim appeared on behalf of Dfts. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Dan Palmer appointed as Mediator. Atty Blackburn to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Vetne and Ahlgrim. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/22/2020. Parties advise they stipulate to the dismissal of Dft, Milbank Insurance Company d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies, without prejudice. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE Attorney and Client. (Blackburn, Thomas)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Thomas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Ahlgrim, Jr on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company (Ahlgrim, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Coates, Spirit Logistics, Inc..(Vetne, J)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement to #4 State Court Complaint with Exhibit A by Defendants Milbank Insurance Company, Spirit Logistics, Inc.. (Vetne, J) Modified on 9/1/2020 to correct title (mrm).
August 31, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
August 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirit Logistics, Inc., robert coates. (Vetne, J)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vetne on behalf of Spirit Logistics, Inc., robert coates (Vetne, J)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4325785.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02d03-2008-ct-000390, filed by Spirit Logistics, Inc., robert coates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vetne, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albright et al v. Coates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Albright
Represented By: Thomas D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Albright
Represented By: Thomas D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: robert coates
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company, d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Represented By: Robert F Ahlgrim, Jr
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dan Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?