Vera Bradley Designs, Inc. v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.
Defendant: Greenbrier International, Inc. and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00338
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The joint motion #20 is GRANTED, and the agreed protective order [20-1] submitted by the parties on 11/12/2020 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an Order of this Court, SUBJECT, HOWEVER to the clarifications and revisions contained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/13/2020. (jat)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) within fourteen (14) days of the parties' Rule 26(f) conference. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 7/6/2021; as to Defendants is 7/6/2021. Discovery deadline is 6/28/2021. Expert Discovery deadline is 6/28/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/26/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/26/2021. Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/12/20. (ksp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by attys Michael Gray and Molly Littman. Dfts appeared by atty Colin Dougherty. The #20 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/3/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT by Vera Bradley Designs, Inc. Joint Report of Parties Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Protective Order)(Gray PHV, Michael)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc..(Dougherty, Colin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Greenbrier International, Inc..(Dougherty, Colin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Dougherty, Colin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D Dougherty on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. (Dougherty, Colin)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael R Gray PHV for Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/14/2020. (ace)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ashley M Bennett Ewald PHV for Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/14/2020. (ace)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Application for Attorney Ashley M. Bennett Ewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4368767(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Molly R Littman PHV for Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/13/2020. (ace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Michael R. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4365936(Gray PHV, Michael) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/8/2020 to include corrected addendum page) (ace). Modified on 10/8/2020 (ace).
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Molly Rose Littman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4360323(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2020: #1 MN Certificate) (ace).
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. (Underwood, Apryl)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT of AO 121. (AO121 and complaint emailed to copyright office) (mlc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
September 29, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 APPENDIX to #1 Complaint, Separate Index of Exhibits by Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Underwood, Apryl)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. (Underwood, Apryl)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4355055.), filed by Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Dollar Tree, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Greenbrier)(Underwood, Apryl) Modified on 10/23/2020 **Filing fee paid $400 receipt number #3025679** (nae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera Bradley Designs, Inc. v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier International, Inc.
Represented By: Colin D Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Colin D Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Bradley Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Apryl Elizabeth Underwood
Represented By: Molly R Littman PHV
Represented By: Ashley M Bennett Ewald PHV
Represented By: Michael R Gray PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?