Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co, LP v. Amick et al
Plaintiff: Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP and Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co., LP
Defendant: HPI Holdings, LTD, Teresa Amick, Approximately 1.09 Acres of Real Estate and an Adjacent Roadway in Grant County, Indiana and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 1:2020cv00342
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vershay, Ryan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 *REFILED correctly at #19 * REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vershay, Ryan) Modified on 11/25/2020 (lhc).
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY FOR JUDGE WILLIAM C LEE: Pursuant to the #16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant HPI Holdings, LTD. n/k/a Hill Development Corporation filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co., LP, Dft HPI Holdings, LTD is dismissed from this cause of action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 71.1(i)(1)(B). (lns)
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant HPI Holdings, LTD. n/k/a Hill Development Corporation by Plaintiff Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co., LP. (Vershay, Ryan)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Holly A Brady recused. Case reassigned to Judge William C Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/19/2020. (jat)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
November 9, 2020 Reset answer deadline to 12/14/2020 for Defendant Teresa Amick. (bas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Teresa Amick ; answer due by 12/14/2020. (Eherenman, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Eherenman on behalf of Teresa Amick (Eherenman, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due for Teresa Amick by 11/14/2020 per #10 Affidavit of Service. (jld)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Teresa Amick on October 24, 2020, filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co., LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of a Special Process Server)(Vershay, Ryan)
October 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/response due 11/20/20 per DE #9 . (kjp)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by HPI Holdings, LTD Notice of Automatic Initial Extension (Mason PHV, Brian)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian E Mason PHV for HPI Holdings, LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/28/2020. (ace)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Brian E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of HPI Holdings, Ltd n/k/a Hill Development. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4382408(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Teresa Amick and HPI Holdings, LTD. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
September 29, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek G Raymond on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP (Raymond, Derek)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP of Rule 71.1 Notice to Defendants of Condemnation Action (Vershay, Ryan)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP. (Vershay, Ryan)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J Vershay on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP (Vershay, Ryan)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teresa Amick, HPI Holdings, LTD( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4355744.), filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Amick, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant HPI)(Vershay, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co, LP v. Amick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, LP
Represented By: Derek G Raymond
Represented By: Ryan J Vershay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co., LP
Represented By: Derek G Raymond
Represented By: Ryan J Vershay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPI Holdings, LTD
Represented By: Brian E Mason PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Amick
Represented By: Robert W Eherenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 1.09 Acres of Real Estate and an Adjacent Roadway in Grant County, Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?