Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc et al v. Hartford Place, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc and Brenda Strout
Defendant: Hartford Place, L.P. and Crownpointe Communities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00372
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline: Defendants' answers due by 1/8/2021. (bas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Crownpointe Communities, LLC, Hartford Place, L.P. ; answer due by January 8, 2021. (Delk, Jason)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Delk on behalf of All Defendants (Delk, Jason)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Crishon on behalf of Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc, Brenda Strout (Crishon, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due 12/8/20 by defendant Hartford Place LP (per #4 ); Answer due 12/11/20 by defendant Crownpointe Communities LLC (per #5 ). (jld)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Larry New, Registered Agent for Crownpointe Communities LLC on November 20, 2020, filed by Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc, Brenda Strout. (Brancart, Christopher)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bob Blume, Registered Agent, for Hartford Place LP on November 17, 2020, filed by Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc, Brenda Strout. (Brancart, Christopher)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crownpointe Communities, LLC, Hartford Place, L.P.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
October 26, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc, Brenda Strout. (Brancart, Christopher)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4379605.), filed by Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc, Brenda Strout. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Brancart, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc et al v. Hartford Place, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana Inc
Represented By: Christopher A Brancart
Represented By: Thomas E Crishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Strout
Represented By: Christopher A Brancart
Represented By: Thomas E Crishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Place, L.P.
Represented By: Jason R Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crownpointe Communities, LLC
Represented By: Jason R Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?