McPeek v. Textron, Inc
Plaintiff: Richard L McPeek
Defendant: TEXTRON, INC d/b/a KAUTEX and Textron, Inc doing business as Kautex
Case Number: 1:2020cv00397
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textron, Inc.(McGowan, Stephanie)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S Wilson on behalf of Textron, Inc (Wilson, Amy)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Textron, Inc ; answer due by January 4, 2021. (McGowan, Stephanie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Kautex for Textron, Inc.. (McGowan, Stephanie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie V McGowan on behalf of Textron, Inc (McGowan, Stephanie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Textron, Inc., d/b/a Kautex c/o Its Registered Agent, CT Corporation System on November 13, 2020, filed by Richard L McPeek. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Textron, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2020: #1 Summons with court seal) (rmf).
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number INN1011991 (mrm)
November 10, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Theisen, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hubley, Nathaniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Defendant filed by Richard L McPeek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hubley, Nathaniel) Modified on 11/12/2020 to correct docket text (ksp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPeek v. Textron, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON, INC d/b/a KAUTEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc doing business as Kautex
Represented By: Amy S Wilson
Represented By: Stephanie V McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L McPeek
Represented By: Nathaniel O Hubley
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?