Wiesehan et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wiesehan, Dennis Wiesehan and Kent C Litchin, ESQ
Defendant: Northern Stamping Co. a foreign corporation doing business as Northern Stamping, Inc. and FCA US, LLC
Estate Plaintiff: Summer Keesler and Kevin Wiesehan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00481
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #28 Plas' Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 3/9/2021 at 10:00 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Text entry order. (mr)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Kent C Litchin, ESQ, Dennis Wiesehan, Stephanie Wiesehan. (Feighner, John)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northern Stamping Co. identifying Corporate Parent Bear Diversified Inc. for Northern Stamping Co... (Crabtree, Jordan)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan T Crabtree on behalf of Northern Stamping Co. (Crabtree, Jordan)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Northern Stamping Co. ; answer due by March 5, 2021. (Shoultz, Richard)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K Shoultz on behalf of Northern Stamping Co. (Shoultz, Richard)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-FCA US Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure, #2 Exhibit 2-FCA US LLC - Business Entity Info, #3 Exhibit 3-FCA US LLC-Corporate Disclosure Statement 2-19-20, #4 Exhibit 4-FCA US LLC - 3-31-20 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit 5-FCA North America Business Entity Info, #6 Exhibit 6-FCA Holdco - Application, #7 Exhibit 7-Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV-Report-Select Pages, #8 Exhibit 8-Northern Stamping, Inc.-Trade Name-Business Entity Info, #9 Exhibit 9-Northern Stamping Co.-Renewal of Trade Name Certificate, #10 Exhibit 10-Northern Stamping Co-Delaware Business Entity)(Morgan PHV, Courtney)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines per #16 AGREED NOTICE. Defendant FCA US, LLC answer due by 3/5/2021. (mrm)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiffs are afforded to and including 2/4/2021 to file a second supplemental jurisdictional statement in an attempt to establish jurisdiction, clarifying: (1) the basis of their assertions regarding the citizenship of Defendant FCA USA LLC, and (2) the state of incorporation of Defendant Northern Stamping Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/28/2021. (bas)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Hyslop, Chelsea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by FCA US, LLC ; answer due by 3/5/21. (Schiferl, Kevin)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Schiferl, Kevin)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T Keck PHV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keck PHV, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney E Morgan PHV, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan PHV, Courtney)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Courtney E Morgan PHV, Jr for Kent C Litchin, ESQ, Dennis Wiesehan, and Stephanie Wiesehan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/26/2021. (ace)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian T Keck PHV for Kent C Litchin, ESQ, Dennis Wiesehan, and Stephanie Wiesehan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/26/2021. (ace)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATEMENT (Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Feighner, John)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Wiesehan, Dennis Wiesehan, Kent C Litchin, ESQ. FCA US, LLC served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Feighner, John)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiffs are AFFORDED to and including 1/29/2021, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/15/2021. (bas)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application for Attorney Brian T. Keck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4450102(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application for Attorney Courtney E. Morgan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4450097(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to reassign this matter to Judge William C. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 12/29/2020. (lhc)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC, Northern Stamping Co.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mrm)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J Spencer Feighner on behalf of Summer Keesler, Kevin Wiesehan (Feighner, J)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John O Feighner on behalf of Summer Keesler, Kevin Wiesehan (Feighner, John)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against FCA US, LLC, Northern Stamping Co.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4434832.), filed by Kevin Wiesehan, Summer Keesler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons FCA US, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Northern Stamping Inc.)(Feighner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiesehan et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Stamping Co. a foreign corporation doing business as Northern Stamping, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan T Crabtree
Represented By: Richard K Shoultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Summer Keesler
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Kevin Wiesehan
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wiesehan
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Represented By: Courtney E Morgan PHV, Jr
Represented By: Brian T Keck PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wiesehan
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Represented By: Courtney E Morgan PHV, Jr
Represented By: Brian T Keck PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent C Litchin, ESQ
Represented By: John O Feighner
Represented By: J Spencer Feighner
Represented By: Courtney E Morgan PHV, Jr
Represented By: Brian T Keck PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?