Evilsizor v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Craig L Evilsizor
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00482
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas L King on behalf of All Plaintiffs (King, Nicholas)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig L Evilsizor. All Defendants, answer due 3/5/2021. (Farnbauch, David) Modified on 1/21/2021 to add answer date due (mrm).
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (shk)
December 23, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (shk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Farnbauch on behalf of Craig L Evilsizor (Farnbauch, David)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages In A Civil Case against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4434841.), filed by Craig L Evilsizor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Farnbauch, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evilsizor v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig L Evilsizor
Represented By: David L Farnbauch
Represented By: Nicholas L King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?