Jackson v. Tom Henry
Plaintiff: JESSE L JACKSON
Defendant: City of Fort Wayne and Tom Henry
Case Number: 1:2021cv00012
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
February 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #6 , Tom Henry answer due 3/22/2021. (nae)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Tom Henry ; answer due by March 22, 2021. (Johnson, Gary)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Gary)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge James T Moody for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/25/2021. (ksc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tom Henry. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
January 13, 2021 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Stowers on behalf of JESSE L JACKSON (Stowers, Gregory)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against City of Fort Wayne( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4449718.), filed by JESSE L JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Stowers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Tom Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE L JACKSON
Represented By: Gregory A Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fort Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Henry
Represented By: Gary D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?