Hanshew v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cindi M Hanshew
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00067
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #10 Social Security Commissioner Answer due 5/3/2021 (nae)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindi M Hanshew. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Trzynka, Ann)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindi M Hanshew. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Trzynka, Ann)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindi M Hanshew. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Trzynka, Ann)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2020-27. (bas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/22/2021. (slm)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (mrm)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number INN1012336 (mrm)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cindi M Hanshew and GRANTING Ms. Hanshew until 3/3/2021, to pay the $402.00 filing fee. If Ms. Hanshew does not respond by that date, this case will be dismissed without further notice for non-payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/2021. (mrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021: #1 Corrected Order) (mrm). Modified on 2/19/2021 to add corrected document (mrm).
February 16, 2021 **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (mlc)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Trzynka on behalf of Cindi M Hanshew (Trzynka, Ann)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cindi M Hanshew. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM Form 285)(Trzynka, Ann)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Cindi M Hanshew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Trzynka, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanshew v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindi M Hanshew
Represented By: Ann M Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?